Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Mazza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1919Born
30 May 194222.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
8 Jun 197353.5AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
8 Jun 197353.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Velia
29 Jun 197353.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Velia
11 Sep 197656.7AppointedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
24 Oct 197656.8InstalledBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
20 Aug 198363.7AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
9 Oct 198363.8InstalledBishop of Piacenza, Italy
1 Dec 199475.0RetiredBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
16 Mar 199878.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Mazza
Bishop Antonio Mazza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piacenza-Bobbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlpicella d’Aveto, Diocese of Bobbio
Ordained PriestSanti Angeli Custodi, Amborzasco, Diocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano)
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Alpicella d’Aveto, Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018