Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pacifico Fiorani

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1855BornCollestellano
15 Apr 190751.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
15 Apr 190751.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
12 May 190751.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
4 Jul 190852.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
10 Mar 191054.3AppointedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
12 May 191761.5AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
22 Jun 192468.6DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Fiorani:
Bishop Pacifico Fiorani (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 69, and Page 75
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013