Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Quintarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1844Born
6 Jun 186824.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 186824.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189550.9AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
24 Mar 189550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
31 Oct 191571.5DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Quintarelli (VIAF: 89329693)
Bishop Bonaventura Quintarelli (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnorea, Diocese of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)
Ordained BishopTor dei Spechi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 477
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017