Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Emilio Bergamaschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troia, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Areopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1843Born
23 Dec 186522.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189350.3AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
16 Jul 189350.4Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
19 Jun 189956.3AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
1909¹65.8ResignedBishop of Troia, Italy
26 Jul 191067.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Areopolis
10 Feb 192581.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Troia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Emilio Bergamaschi
Archbishop Paolo Emilio Bergamaschi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontecorvo, Diocese of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo
Ordained BishopFilles du Sacre-Coeur-via Cavour, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 542, and Page 569
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017