Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Barillari

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Cariati, Italy

Titular Bishop of Memphis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1847Born
24 Sep 187022.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 187123.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 189547.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cariati, Italy
30 May 189547.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
30 Jun 189547.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
25 Nov 190255.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Cariati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Barillari
Bishop Giuseppe Barillari (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Cariati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerra San Bruno, Diocese of Squillace
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 182, and Page 380
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017