Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Scotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1874BornBarano
1898¹23.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ischia, Italy
21 Feb 191136.9AppointedBishop of Cariati, Italy
11 Jun 191137.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati, Italy
13 Dec 191844.7AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
16 Oct 193056.6DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Scotti:
Archbishop Giovanni Scotti (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013