Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fulco Luigi Cardinal Ruffo-Scilla

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1840Born
20 Sep 186222.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 187737.7AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
6 Jan 187837.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
23 May 188747.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
23 May 188747.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
30 Mar 188948.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
14 Dec 189151.6Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 189151.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
29 May 189555.1DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Fulco Luigi Ruffo-Scilla (VIAF: 77490114)
Fulco Luigi Cardinal Ruffo-Scilla (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Vatican chapter chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 449, and Page 545
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1891
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017