Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Maria Sarnelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1835Born
20 Dec 186227.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 187943.8AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
2 Mar 187943.9Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
30 Mar 187943.9InstalledBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
19 Apr 189762.0AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
11 Jul 189762.2InstalledArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Jan 189862.7DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Sarnelli (VIAF: 89416001)
Archbishop Vincenzo Maria Sarnelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Charles ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 191, and Page 405
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Mar 2017