Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Carvelli

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1816Born
22 Sep 183822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 183822.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 187963.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
28 Feb 187963.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
2 Mar 187963.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
23 Jan 188064.0SucceededBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
3 Jul 188266.5AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
1 Jun 188872.4DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Carvelli
Bishop Luigi Carvelli (born , died ) Bishop of Mileto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetilia, Diocese of Policastro
Ordained BishopS. Charles ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 304, and Page 369
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 383
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Mar 2017