Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale de Siena

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1840Born
19 Sep 186323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Sep 189858.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Sep 189858.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
23 Oct 189858.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
25 Nov 192080.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale de Siena (VIAF: 165730081)
Bishop Pasquale de Siena (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 173
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017