Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Müller

Deceased

Bishop of Nardō, Italy

Bishop of Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1850Born
20 Dec 187323.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 189848.6AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
11 Sep 189848.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
13 Aug 192777.5AppointedBishop of Nardō, Italy
8 Feb 193585.0DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Müller
Bishop Gaetano Müller (born , died ) Bishop of Nardō

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,956
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 281
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017