Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Antonio Ermenegildo Cardinal Prisco

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1833BornBoscotrecase
20 Sep 185623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
30 Nov 189663.2Elevated to Cardinal
3 Dec 189663.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
24 Mar 189864.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
24 Mar 189864.5AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
29 May 189864.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
4 Feb 192389.4DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Ermenegildo Prisco:
Cardinal Giuseppe Antonio Ermenegildo Prisco (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
  • a cardinal for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Nov 1896
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 405, and Page 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013