Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Cigliano

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Cyme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1854Born
22 Dec 187723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Sep 189844.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Sep 189844.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyme
23 Oct 189844.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyme
20 Aug 190652.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Cigliano
Bishop Giuseppe Cigliano (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017