Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastijan Francović, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Sion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1800Born
24 Mar 186160.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
24 Mar 186160.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
21 Apr 186161.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
30 Oct 186464.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Sebastijan Francović (VIAF: 305596764)
Bishop Sebastijan Francović O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa
Ordained BishopS. Maria in ara coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 521
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 10
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018