Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Hannan

Deceased

Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1821Born
1845¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 187755.5AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
20 May 187755.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
17 Apr 188260.7DiedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Hannan (VIAF: 104452662)
Archbishop Michael Hannan (born , died ) Archbishop of Halifax

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillmallock, Diocese of Limerick, Ireland
Ordained BishopHalifax, Archdiocese of Halifax, Nova Scotia

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017