Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter McIntyre

Deceased

Bishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1818Born
21 Feb 184324.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 186041.8AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
15 Aug 186042.1Ordained BishopBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
1 May 189172.8DiedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada

MicroData Summary for Peter McIntyre
Bishop Peter McIntyre (born , died ) Bishop of Charlottetown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Peter
Ordained BishopCathedral, Charlottetown, Diocese of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017