Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Ramirez, C.S.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Las Cruces, New Mexico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1936 BornBay City, TX
12 Sep 196024.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of St. Basil
10 Dec 196630.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of St. Basil
27 Oct 198145.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
27 Oct 198145.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vatarba
6 Dec 198145.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vatarba
17 Aug 198245.9AppointedBishop of Las Cruces, New Mexico, USA
18 Oct 198246.1InstalledBishop of Las Cruces, New Mexico, USA
10 Jan 201376.3RetiredBishop of Las Cruces, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Ramirez:
Bishop Ricardo Ramirez C.S.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Las Cruces

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Las Cruces.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jun 2014