Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Ayala y Ayala

Deceased

Bishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1913Born
30 May 194228.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 196248.6AppointedBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
2 Sep 196248.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
5 Jul 198571.6DiedBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Ayala y Ayala
Bishop Rafael Ayala y Ayala (born , died ) Bishop of Tehuacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoatepec de Harinas

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018