Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rutilio Juan del Riego Jáńez, H.S.O.D.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Bernardino, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Daimlaig


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1940 Born
5 Jun 196524.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Hermandad de Sacerdotes Operarios Diocesanos del Sagrado Corazón de Jesús
26 Jul 200564.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA
26 Jul 200564.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Daimlaig
20 Sep 200564.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daimlaig
11 Dec 201575.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Rutilio Juan del Riego Jáńez
Bishop Rutilio Juan del Riego Jáńez H.S.O.D. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Bernardino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdesandinas, Diocese of Astorga, Spain
Ordained PriestNational Shrine of the Immaculate Conception, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopSaint Paul the Apostle, Church, Chino Hills, Diocese of San Bernardino, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Bernardino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,977
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 26 Oct 2022