Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Herman To Paivu

Deceased

Archbishop of Port Moresby


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1912BornTapo
15 Nov 195341.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
1 Jul 197462.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
1 Jul 197462.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Temuniana
29 Oct 197462.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temuniana
19 Dec 197564.0AppointedArchbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
25 Apr 197664.3InstalledArchbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
12 Feb 198169.1DiedArchbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Herman To Paivu:
Archbishop Herman To Paivu (died ) Archbishop of Port Moresby

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013