Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Long Van Nguyen, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of Parramatta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1961 BornDong Nai, Viet Nam
8 Dec 198423.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 Dec 198928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 May 201149.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
20 May 201149.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thala
23 Jun 201149.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thala
5 May 201654.4AppointedBishop of Parramatta, Australia
16 Jun 201654.5InstalledBishop of Parramatta, Australia

MicroData Summary for Vincent Long Van Nguyen
Bishop Vincent Long Van Nguyen O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Parramatta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Parramatta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2011
  • ob: CB, 20 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,080
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016