Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Joseph Hanna

Bishop Emeritus of Wagga Wagga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1941 BornArmidale
9 Dec 196826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Armidale, Australia
5 Feb 200260.1AppointedBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia
15 May 200260.3Ordained BishopBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia
12 Sep 201674.7ResignedBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia

MicroData Summary for Gerard Joseph Hanna
Bishop Gerard Joseph Hanna (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wagga Wagga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wagga Wagga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,185
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Sep 2016