Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edward Bede Cardinal Clancy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sydney

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Vallicella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1923BornLithgow
23 Jul 194925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
25 Oct 197349.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
25 Oct 197349.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Árd Carna
19 Jan 197450.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Árd Carna
24 Nov 197854.9AppointedArchbishop of Canberra (and Goulburn), Australia
12 Feb 198359.1AppointedArchbishop of Sydney, Australia
28 Jun 198864.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198864.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Vallicella
26 Mar 200177.2RetiredArchbishop of Sydney, Australia
3 Aug 201490.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for Edward Bede Clancy:
Edward Bede Cardinal Clancy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sydney

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
  • a cardinal for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 2 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015