Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William John Brennan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wagga Wagga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1938BornArncliffe
21 Dec 196022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
16 Jan 198445.9AppointedBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia
1 Mar 198446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia
5 Feb 200263.9ResignedBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia
31 Aug 201375.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Wagga Wagga, Australia

MicroData Summary for William John Brennan:
Bishop William John Brennan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wagga Wagga

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 791
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015