Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory Paul Homeming, O.C.D.

Bishop of Lismore, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1958 Born
1 Feb 198728.6ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
20 Jul 199133.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
20 Dec 201658.5AppointedBishop of Lismore, Australia
22 Feb 201758.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lismore, Australia

MicroData Summary for Gregory Paul Homeming
Bishop Gregory Paul Homeming O.C.D. (born ) Bishop of Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSydney, Archdiocese of Sydney
Ordained BishopSt Carthage’s, Cathedral, Lismore, Diocese of Lismore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lismore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2016
  • b: CB, 20 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 25 Dec 2016
  • c2: CB, 16 Feb 2017
  • c34/mn: CB, 22 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Feb 2017