Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Richard Placid Burchall, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1810Born
1833²22.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1836²25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Jul 184736.5AppointedBishop of Maitland, Australia
9 Jul 184736.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sydney, Australia
7 Mar 188574.2DiedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Richard Placid Burchall
Father Richard Placid Burchall O.S.B. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAspull, near Wigan, Lancashire
Ordained BishopWoolton
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Woolton

  • a priest for 49.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast