Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Michael Fitzgerald, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

Titular Bishop of Zarna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1903BornTralee, Ireland
6 Jul 193027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Aug 195855.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
15 Aug 195855.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zarna
8 Dec 195855.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zarna
18 Jun 196663.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
19 Mar 196864.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
31 Oct 197168.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for William Michael Fitzgerald:
Bishop William Michael Fitzgerald O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port of Spain

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013