Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin James Field, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1899Born
18 Sep 192627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Jan 195757.5AppointedBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles
25 Mar 195757.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles
4 Aug 196970.0DiedBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Justin James Field
Bishop Justin James Field O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint George’s in Grenada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDown Hatherley, Great Britain

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast