Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Alphonse H.J. Gachet, F.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castries, Saint Lucia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1911BornBazoges-en-Pareds, France
4 Oct 193625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Fils de Marie Immaculée
14 Jan 195745.5AppointedBishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
5 May 195745.8Ordained BishopBishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
18 Nov 197463.4ResignedBishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
13 Nov 198473.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Charles Alphonse H.J. Gachet:
Bishop Charles Alphonse H.J. Gachet F.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Castries

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013