Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Patrick Smith

Deceased

Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1802Born
21 Feb 183734.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Agnus
28 Feb 183734.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
10 Dec 183735.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agnus
26 Oct 184442.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
28 May 184543.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
30 Apr 185048.1AppointedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
6 May 185250.1DiedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Richard Patrick Smith
Archbishop Richard Patrick Smith (born , died ) Archbishop of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArdagh, Ireland

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 466
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 62, and Page 291
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017