Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clyde Martin Harvey

Bishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1948 Born
27 Apr 197627.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
27 Jun 197627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
23 Jun 201768.6AppointedBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles
29 Jul 201768.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Clyde Martin Harvey
Bishop Clyde Martin Harvey (born ) Bishop of Saint George’s in Grenada

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago
Ordained PriestSt. Mark's, Church, Victoria, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago
Ordained BishopSpice Basket, Saint George’s, Diocese of Saint George’s in Grenada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint George’s in Grenada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2017
  • od/c0: CB, 23 Jun 2017
  • c1/bp: CB, 28 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jul 2017