Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Louis Salmon du Châtelier

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1761BornSavigny-sur-Braye
9 Sep 181756.0SelectedBishop of Laon, France
1 Oct 181756.1ConfirmedBishop of Laon, France
10 Jan 182260.4SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
19 Apr 182260.7ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
2 Jun 182260.8Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
8 Apr 184179.6DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Louis Salmon du Châtelier:
Bishop Charles-Louis Salmon du Châtelier (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 183, and Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013