Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Marie-Paul Tharin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1787Born
21 Dec 181124.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Oct 182335.9SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
24 Nov 182336.0ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
19 Jan 182436.2Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
3 Apr 182739.4ResignedBishop of Strasbourg, France
14 Jun 184355.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Marie-Paul Tharin (VIAF: 7379211)
Bishop Claude-Marie-Paul Tharin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBesançon

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,824, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast