Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François de Saunhac-Belcastel

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1765BornAmplac
28 Mar 178924.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 182358.4SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
17 Nov 182358.8ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
18 Jan 182459.0Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
9 Dec 185388.9DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de Saunhac-Belcastel (VIAF: 304784256)
Bishop Jean-François de Saunhac-Belcastel (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016