Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Aimé de Levezou de Vezins

Deceased

Bishop of Agen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1793Born
23 Oct 183643.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 184147.4SelectedBishop of Agen, France
12 Jul 184147.8ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
8 Aug 184147.9Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
14 Aug 184147.9InstalledBishop of Agen, France
11 Apr 186773.6DiedBishop of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Aimé de Levezou de Vezins (VIAF: 31987431)
Bishop Jean-Aimé de Levezou de Vezins (born , died ) Bishop of Agen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMillau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,841, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast