Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Molin

Deceased

Bishop of Viviers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1759BornJob
18 Dec 178425.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 181758.5SelectedBishop of Viviers, France
10 Apr 182364.2SelectedBishop of Viviers, France
16 May 182364.3ConfirmedBishop of Viviers, France
6 Jul 182364.5Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
25 Jul 182566.5DiedBishop of Viviers, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for André Molin:
Bishop André Molin (born , died ) Bishop of Viviers

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013