Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Jacques de Chamon

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Claude


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1767BornBulgnéville
18 Sep 179023.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182355.5SelectedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
16 May 182355.8ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
13 Jul 182356.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
30 Aug 182356.1InstalledBishop of Saint-Claude, France
28 May 185183.8DiedBishop of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Jacques de Chamon:
Bishop Antoine-Jacques de Chamon (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Claude

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013