Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-François-Nicolas Millaux

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1756BornChâteaubourg
10 Mar 178124.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182366.2SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
16 May 182366.5ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
6 Jul 182366.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
31 Jul 182366.7InstalledBishop of Nevers, France
19 Feb 182972.2DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-François-Nicolas Millaux:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-François-Nicolas Millaux (born , died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013