Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François-Marie Le Pappe de Trévern

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1754BornMorlaix
178429.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182368.3SelectedBishop of Aire, France
16 May 182368.6ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
13 Jul 182368.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
13 Dec 182672.1SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
9 Apr 182772.5ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
27 Aug 184287.8DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François-Marie Le Pappe de Trévern:
Bishop Jean-François-Marie Le Pappe de Trévern (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 88, and Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013