Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Joseph-Antoine-Laurent de la Rivoire de La Tourette

Deceased

Bishop of Valence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1762BornTournon
24 Mar 178724.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 181755.2SelectedBishop of Valence, France
23 Aug 181956.9ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
8 Nov 181957.1Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
3 Apr 184077.6DiedBishop of Valence, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Joseph-Antoine-Laurent de la Rivoire de La Tourette:
Bishop Marie-Joseph-Antoine-Laurent de la Rivoire de La Tourette (born , died ) Bishop of Valence

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013