Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Marie Cliquet de Fontenay

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1754BornDunkerque
9 Sep 181763.5SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
1 Oct 181763.6ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
1 Jul 182066.3SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
28 Aug 182066.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
24 Sep 182066.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
28 Oct 182066.6InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
13 Oct 182470.6DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Cliquet de Fontenay:
Archbishop Jean-Marie Cliquet de Fontenay (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 113, and Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013