Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Charles-Louis-Rose de Lostanges-Saint-Alvère

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1763BornVersailles
8 Mar 178824.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181753.9SelectedBishop of Périgueux, France
1 Oct 181753.9ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux, France
21 Oct 182158.0Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux, France
21 Nov 182158.1InstalledBishop of Périgueux, France
11 Aug 183672.8DiedBishop of Périgueux, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Charles-Louis-Rose de Lostanges-Saint-Alvère:
Bishop Alexandre-Charles-Louis-Rose de Lostanges-Saint-Alvère (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013