Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre-Marie Cadalen

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1788BornAlban
23 May 181223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Albi, France
30 Jul 183344.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
30 Sep 183344.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
26 Nov 183345.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
17 Apr 183647.5DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre-Marie Cadalen:
Bishop Jean-Pierre-Marie Cadalen (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013