Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin-Louis de Montblanc

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1767BornSausses
1792¹24.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181750.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
1 Oct 181750.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
17 Jan 182153.6SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tours, France
27 Jun 182154.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tours, France
27 Jun 182154.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
12 Aug 182154.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
24 Nov 182457.4SucceededArchbishop of Tours, France
28 Dec 184174.5DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Louis de Montblanc
Archbishop Augustin-Louis de Montblanc (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136, and Page 173
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jul 2016