Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François-Marie Petit-Benoit de Chaffoy

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1752BornBessançon
21 Dec 177624.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 181765.8SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
24 Sep 182169.6ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
21 Oct 182169.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
29 Sep 183785.6DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François-Marie Petit-Benoit de Chaffoy:
Bishop Charles-François-Marie Petit-Benoit de Chaffoy (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013