Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul-Ambroise Frère de Villefrancon

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1754³BornBesançon
20 Dec 177723.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 182166.7SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Besançon, France
27 Jun 182167.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Besançon, France
27 Jun 182167.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
12 Aug 182167.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Adana
2 May 182368.9SucceededArchbishop of Besançon, France
27 Mar 182873.8DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul-Ambroise Frère de Villefrancon:
Archbishop Paul-Ambroise Frère de Villefrancon (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 58, and Page 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013