Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimir-Alexis-Joseph Wicart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Laval


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1799BornMéteren
22 Sep 182122.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 184546.0SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
24 Apr 184546.1ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
11 Jun 184546.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
20 Jun 184546.3InstalledBishop of Fréjus, France
12 Sep 185556.5SelectedBishop of Laval, France
28 Sep 185556.6ConfirmedBishop of Laval, France
3 May 187677.2RetiredBishop of Laval, France
8 Apr 187980.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Casimir-Alexis-Joseph Wicart:
Bishop Casimir-Alexis-Joseph Wicart (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Laval

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 579
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013