Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Charles-Camille Lambrecht

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1848BornWelden
8 Apr 187123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
26 Mar 188638.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
26 Mar 188638.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
4 Apr 188638.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
17 Jun 188840.4SucceededBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
2 Jul 188941.4DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Henri-Charles-Camille Lambrecht:
Bishop Henri-Charles-Camille Lambrecht (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 18.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 282
  • c2+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014