Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin von Riedel

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1802BornLamerdingen
28 May 182523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
182926.8IncardinatedPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
12 Sep 184139.5SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
24 Jan 184239.9ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
13 Mar 184240.0Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
6 Nov 185755.7DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Valentin von Riedel (VIAF: 49979274)
Bishop Valentin von Riedel (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016