Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Junosza Gałecki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków, Poland

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1811Born
8 Mar 183422.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 186251.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
25 Sep 186251.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
19 Oct 186251.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
1879²67.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
10 Mar 188573.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Junosza Gałecki (VIAF: 250438210)
Bishop Antoni Junosza Gałecki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadłów, Diocese of Tarnów
Ordained BishopS. Maria del anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017